Kwok Shan Pun
Corporate Officer/Principal at Sha Tin District Council
Kwok Shan Pun active positions
Companies | Position | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Sha Tin District Council | Corporate Officer/Principal | 31/12/2012 | - |
Career history of Kwok Shan Pun
Former positions of Kwok Shan Pun
Companies | Position | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
BRADAVERSE EDUCATION (INT'L) INVESTMENTS GROUP LIMITED | Director/Board Member | 25/11/2014 | 25/10/2017 |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 25/11/2014 | 25/10/2017 | |
Sha Tin District Council | Corporate Officer/Principal | 31/12/2003 | 31/12/2010 |
Training of Kwok Shan Pun
South China Normal University | Undergraduate Degree |
University of South Australia | Masters Business Admin |
Huaqiao University | Doctorate Degree |
Statistics
International
Hong Kong | 3 |
China | 3 |
Australia | 2 |
Operational
Corporate Officer/Principal | 2 |
Director/Board Member | 1 |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 1 |
Sectoral
Consumer Services | 4 |
Commercial Services | 2 |
Positions held
Active
Inactive
Listed companies
Private companies
Linked companies
Listed companies | 1 |
---|---|
BRADAVERSE EDUCATION (INT'L) INVESTMENTS GROUP LIMITED | Commercial Services |
Private companies | 1 |
---|---|
Sha Tin District Council |
- Stock Market
- Insiders
- Kwok Shan Pun
- Experience