G. Dawson
Chairman at NOVA NET LEASE REIT
Net worth: 1 M $ as of 30/03/2024
Profile
G.
Steven Dawson is currently the President, Chief Executive Officer & Trustee at American Manufactured Housing Real Estate Investment Trust, Chairman at Corworth Building Systems LLC, Chairman at Nova Net Lease REIT, Independent Director at Medical Properties Trust, Inc., Director at American Campus Communities Operating Partnership LP, Director at Cohen & Co. LLC (Pennsylvania), Independent Director at Cohen & Co., Inc., Managing Director & Manager at CM Group, Inc., Managing Director at Novus Merchant Partners, Inc., Director at MPT Operating Partnership LP, Member-Real Estate Roundtable at Mays Business School, and Partner at Sparrowhawk Holdings-Powerone LP.
He previously served as the President, Chief Executive Officer & Trustee at American Manufactured Communities REIT, Inc., Director at US Restaurant Properties, Inc. (Old), Director at AmREIT, Inc., Director at Sunset Financial Resources, Inc., Lead Independent Director at American Campus Communities, Inc., Director at Trustreet Properties, Inc., Director at Desert Capital REIT, Inc., Director at Alesco Financial, Inc., Chief Financial Officer & Senior Vice President at Camden Property Trust, and Chief Financial Officer, Secretary & Treasurer at CM REIT, Inc. He obtained his undergraduate degree from Texas A&M University in 1980.
Known holdings in public companies
Company | Date | Number of shares | Valuation | Valuation date |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/03/2024 | 163,500 ( 0.03% ) | 768 450 $ | 30/03/2024 | |
COHEN & COMPANY INC
1.50% | 20/12/2023 | 28,916 ( 1.50% ) | 206 460 $ | 30/03/2024 |
NOVA NET LEASE REIT
9.82% | 07/01/2024 | 712,242 ( 9.82% ) | 153 132 $ | 30/03/2024 |
G. Dawson active positions
Companies | Position | Start |
---|---|---|
MEDICAL PROPERTIES TRUST, INC. | Director/Board Member | 31/03/2004 |
COHEN & COMPANY INC. | Director/Board Member | 10/01/2005 |
NOVA NET LEASE REIT | Chairman | - |
Cohen & Co. LLC (Pennsylvania)
Cohen & Co. LLC (Pennsylvania) Investment ManagersFinance Cohen & Co. LLC engages in the provision of financial services. It specialzies in asset management, capital markets, loan trading, and investment services. The company was founded in 1999 is headquartered in Philadelphia, PA. | Director/Board Member | 10/01/2005 |
Sparrowhawk Holdings-Powerone LP | Corporate Officer/Principal | 31/12/2002 |
Novus Merchant Partners, Inc.
Novus Merchant Partners, Inc. Investment ManagersFinance Novus Merchant Partners, Inc. is a merchant and investment bank based in Canada, established in 2016. Novus focuses on various sectors, including real estate, technology, agriculture, cannabis, manufacturing, consumer products, healthcare, aviation, and cleantech. The private company is located at 130 King Street West, Exchange Tower, Suite 1205, Toronto, ON M5X 1A9, Canada. The Canadian company invests its own capital and provides capital markets, managerial, and boardroom expertise to enhance value for its clients. The company takes advantage of its deep sector awareness and longstanding, diversified international capital market relationships. Novus has proven expertise in corporate finance, merchant banking, and mergers and acquisitions, which speaks to its demonstrated ability to create continued success for its partners and clients. Novus Merchant Partners was founded by Justin Barragan, Charles Shin, and Ronald A. Rimer, and Ronald A. Rimer has been the CEO since incorporation. | Corporate Officer/Principal | - |
Mays Business School | Corporate Officer/Principal | - |
American Campus Communities Operating Partnership LP
American Campus Communities Operating Partnership LP Real Estate DevelopmentFinance American Campus Communities Operating Partnership LP engages in the management and development of student housing properties. Its business segment are: wholly-owned properties, on-campus participating properties, development services and property management services. The company was founded on August 5, 2004 and is headquartered in Austin, TX. | Director/Board Member | - |
American Manufactured Housing Real Estate Investment Trust
American Manufactured Housing Real Estate Investment Trust Real Estate Investment TrustsFinance American Manufactured Housing Real Estate Investment Trust is a Real Estate Investment Trust/REIT. The CEO of the American company is G. Steven Dawson. | Chief Executive Officer | - |
░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░ ░░░ | ░░░░░░░░ | - |
░░ ░░░░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
Former positions of G. Dawson
Companies | Position | End |
---|---|---|
░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░ ░░░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░ ░░ ░░░░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
░░░░░░░ ░░░░ ░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
Training of G. Dawson
Texas A&M University | Undergraduate Degree |
Experiences
Positions held
Connections
1st degree connections
1st degree companies
Male
Female
Members of the board
Executives
Linked companies
Listed companies | 3 |
---|---|
CAMDEN PROPERTY TRUST | Finance |
MEDICAL PROPERTIES TRUST, INC. | Finance |
COHEN & COMPANY INC. | Finance |
Private companies | 19 |
---|---|
US Restaurant Properties, Inc. (Old) | Finance |
AmREIT, Inc. /Old/
AmREIT, Inc. /Old/ Real Estate Investment TrustsFinance The Group's principal activity is to acquire, manage and develop premier retail frontage properties located in high-traffic and highly populated areas. Its portfolio consists of conservatively leveraged, grocery anchored neighborhood shopping centers, multi-tenant and single tenant properties leased to companies such as Kroger, Walgreen's, GAP and Starbucks. It's business model consists of a real estate operating business, a securities company and a retail partnership business. The real estate operating business focuses on the development, acquisition, management, brokerage and ownership of commercial retail real estate. The in-house NASD-registered securities group provides direct access to the independent financial planning market. Through retail partnership funds, it captures recurring development, leasing, property management and asset management fees for services performed while maintaining ownership interest and profit participation. It operates solely in US | Finance |
Sunset Financial Resources, Inc. | Finance |
American Campus Communities, Inc.
American Campus Communities, Inc. Real Estate Investment TrustsFinance American Campus Communities, Inc. engages in the development, ownership, and management of student housing communities. It operates through the following segments: Owned Properties, On-Campus Participating Properties, Development Services, and Property Management Services. The Owned Properties segment refers to locations with close proximity to the school campus, generally with pedestrian, bicycle, and university shuttle access. The On-Campus Participating Properties segment consists of on-campus properties which are operated under long-term ground or facility leases with university systems. The Development Services segment includes development and construction management services that the company provides through taxable real estate investment trust subsidiaries for third-party owners. The Property Management Services segment covers marketing, leasing administration, facilities maintenance, business administration, accounts payable, accounts receivable, financial reporting, capital projects, and residence life student development. The company was founded by William C. Bayless Jr. in 1993 and is headquartered in Austin, TX. | Finance |
American Campus Communities Operating Partnership LP
American Campus Communities Operating Partnership LP Real Estate DevelopmentFinance American Campus Communities Operating Partnership LP engages in the management and development of student housing properties. Its business segment are: wholly-owned properties, on-campus participating properties, development services and property management services. The company was founded on August 5, 2004 and is headquartered in Austin, TX. | Finance |
CM REIT, Inc.
CM REIT, Inc. Real Estate Investment TrustsFinance CM REIT, Inc. operates as a real estate investment trust. The firm specializes in the financing of real estate projects. The company was founded in November 2008 and is headquartered in Henderson, NV. | Finance |
American Manufactured Communities REIT, Inc.
American Manufactured Communities REIT, Inc. Real Estate Investment TrustsFinance American Manufactured Communities REIT, Inc. is a Real Estate Investment Trust/REIT. The private company is based in Chicago, IL. | Finance |
Trustreet Properties, Inc.
Trustreet Properties, Inc. Real Estate Investment TrustsFinance Trustreet Properties, Inc. provides real estate investment trust services. The company offers financing options such as triple-net leasing, mortgage loans and advisory services. It also provides financial services to operators of national and regional restaurant chains. The company is headquartered in Orlando, FL | Finance |
Desert Capital REIT, Inc.
Desert Capital REIT, Inc. Real Estate Investment TrustsFinance Desert Capital REIT, Inc. specialized in the financing of real estate projects by providing short-term mortgage loans to homebuilders and commercial developers in markets. The company was founded in December 2003 and was headquartered in Henderson, NV. | Finance |
Alesco Financial, Inc.
Alesco Financial, Inc. Real Estate Investment TrustsFinance Alesco Financial, Inc. operates as a real estate investment trust, which makes investments in real estate-related and other securities. It invests in subordinated debt financings originated by its manager or third parties, primarily in the form of trust preferred securities, issued by banks or bank holding companies and insurance companies, and surplus notes issued by insurance companies; leveraged loans made to small and mid-sized companies in a variety of industries, including the consumer products and manufacturing industries, and mortgage loans, other real estate-related senior and subordinated debt securities, and residential mortgage-backed securities. The company is headquartered in Philadelphia, PA. | Finance |
MPT Operating Partnership LP
MPT Operating Partnership LP Finance/Rental/LeasingFinance MPT Operating Partnership, L.P. operates as a healthcare REIT which acquires and develops healthcare facilities and lease the facilities to healthcare operating companies under long-term net leases. The company was founded in 2003 and is headquartered in Birmingham, Alabama. | Finance |
Sandstone Equity Investors LLC
Sandstone Equity Investors LLC Financial ConglomeratesFinance Sandstone Equity Investors LLC is a private equity group. The private company is based in Henderson, NV and has subsidiaries in United States. | Finance |
Cohen & Co. LLC (Pennsylvania)
Cohen & Co. LLC (Pennsylvania) Investment ManagersFinance Cohen & Co. LLC engages in the provision of financial services. It specialzies in asset management, capital markets, loan trading, and investment services. The company was founded in 1999 is headquartered in Philadelphia, PA. | Finance |
CM Group, Inc.
CM Group, Inc. Specialty StoresRetail Trade CM Group, Inc. operates retail stores. Todd B. Parriott has been the CEO of the Canadian company since 2007. | Retail Trade |
Corworth Building Systems LLC
Corworth Building Systems LLC Building ProductsProducer Manufacturing Corworth Building Systems LLC designs, manufactures, delivers, and installs modular buildings. The private company is based in Marble Falls, TX. | Producer Manufacturing |
American Manufactured Housing Real Estate Investment Trust
American Manufactured Housing Real Estate Investment Trust Real Estate Investment TrustsFinance American Manufactured Housing Real Estate Investment Trust is a Real Estate Investment Trust/REIT. The CEO of the American company is G. Steven Dawson. | Finance |
Novus Merchant Partners, Inc.
Novus Merchant Partners, Inc. Investment ManagersFinance Novus Merchant Partners, Inc. is a merchant and investment bank based in Canada, established in 2016. Novus focuses on various sectors, including real estate, technology, agriculture, cannabis, manufacturing, consumer products, healthcare, aviation, and cleantech. The private company is located at 130 King Street West, Exchange Tower, Suite 1205, Toronto, ON M5X 1A9, Canada. The Canadian company invests its own capital and provides capital markets, managerial, and boardroom expertise to enhance value for its clients. The company takes advantage of its deep sector awareness and longstanding, diversified international capital market relationships. Novus has proven expertise in corporate finance, merchant banking, and mergers and acquisitions, which speaks to its demonstrated ability to create continued success for its partners and clients. Novus Merchant Partners was founded by Justin Barragan, Charles Shin, and Ronald A. Rimer, and Ronald A. Rimer has been the CEO since incorporation. | Finance |
Sparrowhawk Holdings-Powerone LP | |
Nova Net Lease REIT |
- Stock Market
- Insiders
- G. Dawson