Hans Østergaard
Chairman at HNC Group A/S
Hans Østergaard active positions
Companies | Position | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
HNC Group A/S
HNC Group A/S Industrial MachineryProducer Manufacturing Part of Nordstjernan AB, HNC Group A/S is a Danish company that manufactures industrial automation components. The company is based in Vemmelev, Denmark. The company was founded in 1979 by Henning Nielsen. HNC Group was acquired by Momentum Group AB on June 01, 2022. | Chairman | 02/06/2010 | - |
HNC Holding ApS | Chairman | 02/06/2010 | - |
CS Electric Nord ApS | Chairman | - | - |
Career history of Hans Østergaard
Former positions of Hans Østergaard
Companies | Position | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
SPAR NORD BANK A/S | Director/Board Member | 02/06/2010 | 21/04/2015 |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 31/12/2008 | 21/04/2015 | |
Dyrlægerne Himmerland Kvæg A/S
Dyrlægerne Himmerland Kvæg A/S Agricultural Commodities/MillingProcess Industries Dyrlægerne Himmerland Kvæg A/S operates cattle veterinary services. It also provides advise on the latest knowledge regarding cattle and other production animals such mink and sheep. The company was founded on December 23, 2009 and is headquartered in Aars, Denmark. | Director/Board Member | 22/02/2011 | - |
HNC Nord A/S | Chairman | 02/06/2010 | - |
CS Electric A/S
CS Electric A/S Miscellaneous Commercial ServicesCommercial Services Part of Caverion Oyj, CS Electric A/S is a Danish company that provides sustainable development technology and energy services. The company is based in Esbjerg, Denmark. The company was founded in 1973. The CEO is Søren Mathiasen. CS Electric was acquired by Caverion Oyj from JMI Gruppen A/S on September 01, 2022. | Chairman | 02/06/2010 | - |
Statistics
International
Denmark | 8 |
Operational
Chairman | 5 |
Director/Board Member | 2 |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 1 |
Sectoral
Finance | 2 |
Commercial Services | 2 |
Producer Manufacturing | 2 |
Positions held
Active
Inactive
Listed companies
Private companies
Linked companies
Listed companies | 1 |
---|---|
SPAR NORD BANK A/S | Finance |
Private companies | 6 |
---|---|
CS Electric A/S
CS Electric A/S Miscellaneous Commercial ServicesCommercial Services Part of Caverion Oyj, CS Electric A/S is a Danish company that provides sustainable development technology and energy services. The company is based in Esbjerg, Denmark. The company was founded in 1973. The CEO is Søren Mathiasen. CS Electric was acquired by Caverion Oyj from JMI Gruppen A/S on September 01, 2022. | Commercial Services |
HNC Group A/S
HNC Group A/S Industrial MachineryProducer Manufacturing Part of Nordstjernan AB, HNC Group A/S is a Danish company that manufactures industrial automation components. The company is based in Vemmelev, Denmark. The company was founded in 1979 by Henning Nielsen. HNC Group was acquired by Momentum Group AB on June 01, 2022. | Producer Manufacturing |
HNC Holding ApS | |
HNC Nord A/S | |
Dyrlægerne Himmerland Kvæg A/S
Dyrlægerne Himmerland Kvæg A/S Agricultural Commodities/MillingProcess Industries Dyrlægerne Himmerland Kvæg A/S operates cattle veterinary services. It also provides advise on the latest knowledge regarding cattle and other production animals such mink and sheep. The company was founded on December 23, 2009 and is headquartered in Aars, Denmark. | Process Industries |
CS Electric Nord ApS |
- Stock Market
- Insiders
- Hans Østergaard
- Experience